+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Berryhill.
- From consent calendar.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4971.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 5
May 15, 2014: AB 1647 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor