+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5243.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 20. Page 5078.)
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27).
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1643 Gonzalez By Block
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2016: AB 1643 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 20
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 5
April 20, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Gonzalez
Type:
Primary Sponsor