+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 14, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor