+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4589.)
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.)
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 28, 2016: AB 1638 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor