+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D., and then be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- Measure version as amended on March 10 corrected.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor