+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 329, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 3025.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2476.).
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 12).
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1790.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 7, 2017: AB 1636 AGUIAR-CURRY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 6
September 5, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1636 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Jackson
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 9
July 12, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 30, 2017: AB 1636 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
May 10, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor