+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 158, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1898.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 13, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1633
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 1633 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 17, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor