+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor