+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1619.).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
June 25, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB163 Williams
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2015: AB 163 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2015: AB 163 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1