+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4411.).
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4240.)
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
On February 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 11, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1628 Fox By Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 28, 2014: AB 1628 FOX Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
March 25, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor