+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3417.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2764.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2011.)
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1620.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 11, 2019: AB 1622 Carrillo Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1622 Carrillo By Hurtado
- Yeas: 40
July 8, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 28, 2019: AB 1622 Carrillo Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 20
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor