+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor