+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 157, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2569.).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2022.).
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on June 12 corrected.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1613.)
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2017: AB 1616 NAZARIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1616 Nazarian
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2017: AB 1616 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 9
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor