+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 156, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2569.).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 17, 2017: AB 1615 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
July 13, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1615
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2017: AB 1615 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 4, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor