+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 9. Page 2157.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2019: AB 1611 Chiu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 23
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 4