+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and EQ.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 1891.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 7.) (May 16).
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 23).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 25).
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 25, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
May 23, 2019: AB 161 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 13
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
March 25, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2