+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 14. Page 1903.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On January 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 161 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
March 29, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor