+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor