+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3065.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1785.)
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On December 4, 2012 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: AB 16 PÉREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB16 John A. Pérez By Hancock
- Yeas: 39
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2013: AB 16 PÉREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor