+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1800.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 13, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2017: AB 1594 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 24, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor