+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6469.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.)
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4817.).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5344.)
- Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5220.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2014: AB 1592 GAINES Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 79
August 25, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1592 Beth Gaines By Padilla Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
May 29, 2014: AB 1592 GAINES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19