+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 306, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2926.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2875.)
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2455.).
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1657.)
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 17.
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 8, 2021: AB 1589 G.O. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1589 G.O. (Frazier) By Dodd
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 27, 2021: AB 1589 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Governmental Organization
Type:
Primary Sponsor