+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On January 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Levine.
On January 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (January 23).
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 1).
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On January 31, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
On January 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 1, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3