+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died at Desk.
On September 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5007.).
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5001.)
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 5001.)
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1,
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5365.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
On March 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 30, 2014: Assembly 3rd Supp 7 AB1578 Pan By Steinberg Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2014: AB 1578 PAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2