+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 39, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5379.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 30).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.)
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4381.).
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2020: AB 1577 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2020: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
August 28, 2020: Special Consent AB1577
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 13, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 29, 2020: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 3, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2019: AB 1577 Burke Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor