+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Motion "to be concurred in" failed passage.
- Reconsideration refused. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.)
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
- Filed with the Chief Clerk.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2.).
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1253.).
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 8.
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (11)
August 31, 2022: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
August 31, 2022: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1577 Stone et al. By Wiener
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 29, 2021: AB 1577 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor