+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On January 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3717.)
On January 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Levine.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Levine.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 2).
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 11, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor