+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5240.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) .
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 1571 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1