+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1387.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On January 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 12.
On January 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
July 19, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2017: AB 157 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor