+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5239.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) .
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 11, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
May 28, 2014: AB 1568 GROVE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
March 26, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor