+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On January 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 13, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor