+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 759, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3513.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2820.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1631.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 12, 2019: AB 1564 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1564 Berman By Dodd
- Yeas: 40
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 13, 2019: AB 1564 Berman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor