+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 10).
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1529.)
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
July 10, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 15, 2017: AB 1560 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor