+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 369, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6570.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6565.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5574.).
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5557.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5375.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5314.)
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29).
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 5203.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (May 27).
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2016: AB 1550 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 5
August 31, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading (Supplemental File 1) AB1550 Gomez By De León
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
August 8, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2016: AB 1550 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor