+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 22, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor