+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A. & A.R.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor