+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2741.).
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 9).
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2510.)
- Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Page 2510.)
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2777.).
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 24).
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee August 15.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54)
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
September 11, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1544 Cooley By Anderson Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1544 Cooley By Anderson Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2015: AB 1544 COOLEY Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
August 24, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor