+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1618.).
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1446.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 26.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
June 25, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1541 Committee On P. & C.P. (Gatto)
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1541 Committee On P. & C.P. (Gatto)
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 16, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 14, 2015: AB 1541 P. & C.P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 1541 P. & C.P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection
Type:
Primary Sponsor