+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2301.).
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 0. Page 963.)
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1540 Bloom et al. By Stern
- Yeas: 40
April 6, 2017: AB 1540 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 23
March 29, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor