+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 662, Statutes of 2013.
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2765.).
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1976.).
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 17).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1664.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 23).
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
On January 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
On January 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 30, 2013: AB 154 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
August 26, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB154 Atkins By Jackson
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
July 3, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
June 17, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2013: AB 154 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2013: AB 154 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading Amend By WALDRON Set #3 Motion to Lay on the Table By PÉREZ, V.M.
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 6
April 9, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4