+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor