+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 876, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6349.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4703.).
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5367.)
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 22.
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2014: AB 1539 HAGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 21, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1539 Hagman By Huff
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2014: AB 1539 HAGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7