+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 732, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2582.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16).
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1560.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 25.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1536 Committee On E.&R.(Ridley-Thomas) By Anderson
- Yeas: 40
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1536 Committee On E.&R.(Ridley-Thomas) By Anderson
- Yeas: 40
June 16, 2015: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 22, 2015: AB 1536 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 22, 2015: AB 1536 E. & R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 13, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Elections and Redistricting
Type:
Primary Sponsor