+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 6320.).
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.)
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4655.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 5236.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) .
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
On January 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 22, 2014: AB 1532 GATTO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1532 Gatto By Leno
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
May 28, 2014: AB 1532 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation.
- Yeas: 7