+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 1, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
On February 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor