+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 19).
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Nielsen.
- From Consent Calendar.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 18.
On March 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
June 23, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 14, 2015: AB 1530 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 1530 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9