+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor