+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On January 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor