+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 205, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 5839.).
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4143.).
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4953.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On January 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 4, 2014: AB 1523 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
June 26, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd AB1523 Atkins
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
June 10, 2014: Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2014: AB 1523 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
May 7, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1