+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
April 7, 2014: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor